Global Patent Index - EP 1057915 A1

EP 1057915 A1 2000-12-06 - Biodegradable filament nonwoven fabric and method of producing the same

Title (en)

Biodegradable filament nonwoven fabric and method of producing the same

Title (de)

Vliesstoff aus biologisch abbaubaren Filamentfäden und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Tissu non-tissé à base de filaments biodégradables et méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1057915 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99110694 A

Priority

EP 99110694 A

Abstract (en)

A biodegradable filament nonwoven fabric is provided which is composed of filaments of a polylactic acid based polymer. The polylactic acid based polymer is selected from the group consisting of poly-D-lactic acid, poly-L-lactic acid, copolymers of D-lactic acid and L-lactic acid, copolymers of D-lactic acid and a hydroxycarboxylic acid, copolymers of L-lactic acid and a hydroxycarboxylic acid, and copolymers of D-lactic acid, L-lactic acid and a hydroxycarboxylic acid, which have melting points of not lower than 100 DEG C, and blends of any of these polymers which have melting points of not lower than 100 DEG C. The filaments of the polylactic acid based polymer have a birefringence of 10x10<-3> to 25x10<-3>, a degree of crystallinity of 12 to 30wt%, and a crystal size of not greater than 80 ANGSTROM as measured axially of the filaments. The nonwoven fabric has a boiling water shrinkage percentage of not higher than 15%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/42; D01F 6/62; D04H 1/48; D04H 1/54; D04H 3/14; D04H 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/62 (2006.01); D04H 1/42 (2012.01); D04H 1/435 (2012.01); D04H 1/48 (2012.01); D04H 1/54 (2012.01); D04H 1/541 (2012.01); D04H 1/55 (2012.01); D04H 1/555 (2012.01); D04H 1/56 (2006.01); D04H 3/011 (2012.01); D04H 3/105 (2012.01); D04H 3/12 (2006.01); D04H 3/14 (2012.01); D04H 3/147 (2012.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/12 (2013.01); D01F 6/625 (2013.01); D04H 1/4266 (2013.01); D04H 1/435 (2013.01); D04H 1/4382 (2013.01); D04H 1/48 (2013.01); D04H 1/54 (2013.01); D04H 1/541 (2013.01); D04H 1/55 (2013.01); D04H 1/555 (2013.01); D04H 1/56 (2013.01); D04H 3/011 (2013.01); D04H 3/105 (2013.01); D04H 3/14 (2013.01); D04H 3/147 (2013.01); D04H 3/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057915 A1 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091218

2008-09-24 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080822

2008-04-02 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080227

2008-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080218

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI