Global patent index - EP 1057918 A1

EP 1057918 A1 2000-12-06 - Method and device for changing shuttles of a shuttle embroidery machine

Title (en)

Method and device for changing shuttles of a shuttle embroidery machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auswechseln der Schiffchen einer Schiffchenstickmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le changement des navettes dans une machine à broder à navettes

Publication

EP 1057918 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810468 A

Priority

EP 99810468 A

Abstract (en)

To exchange the shuttle at a shuttle embroidery machine, a lifter (17) withdraws the shuttle (57) from the shuttle paths (59). Shuttles for use are prepared in container shafts (13), which are allowed to enter the shuttle paths (59) when the existing shuttles (57) are lifted clear. The replacement shuttles are stored in their container shafts (13) on an angled plane. They are held in place by the lifter (17) until a shuttle (57) is withdrawn from its path and the route is clear for the new shuttle to enter the shuttle path (59). An Independent claim is included for an embroidery machine shuttle exchange mechanism with a store (13) to hold the reserve shuttles. It has a grip (21) to insert the new shuttle into the shuttle path (59) when the old shuttle (57) has been lifted clear.

Abstract (de)

Zum Schiffchenwechsel werden einzusetzende Schiffchen in die Schächte (13) der Schiffchenwechselvorrichtung eingefüllt. Diese wird dann nach dem Ziehen der oberen Treibernägel auf das Stöckli (11) der Stickmaschine aufgesetzt. Durch Betätigung des Schaltarms (35) werden die Greiferglieder (21) abgesenkt, damit die Federhaken (45) die herauszunehmenden Schiffchen (57) erfassen. Durch Betätigung des Schaltarms (35) in entgegengesetzter Richtung werden die herauszunehmenden Schiffchen in die Schächte (15) gehoben und die einzusetzenden Schiffchen rutschen in die Schiffchenbahnen (59) ins Stöckli (11). Die Schiffchenwechselvorrichtung kann nun von der Stickmaschine entfernt werden. Nach dem Einschieben der Treibernägel ist diese wieder zum Sticken bereit. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05C 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05C 11/18 (2006.01); D05C 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05C 13/06 (2013.01); D05C 11/18 (2013.01); D05D 2207/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057918 A1 20001206; EP 1057918 B1 20020904; AT 223528 T 20020915; DE 59902558 D1 20021010; KR 100479007 B1 20050330; KR 20000075412 A 20001215; TW 451011 B 20010821

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060528

2005-06-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902558

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-10

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 223528

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI