Global Patent Index - EP 1057919 A2

EP 1057919 A2 2000-12-06 - Processor and process for liquid ammonia treatment of hank yarn

Title (en)

Processor and process for liquid ammonia treatment of hank yarn

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Nassbehandlung mit Ammoniak von Garnsträhnen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour le traitement au mouillé avec ammoniaque des fils textiles sous forme d'écheveau

Publication

EP 1057919 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111714 A

Priority

  • JP 15257799 A
  • JP 15258399 A

Abstract (en)

It is an object of this invention to provide a liquid ammonia treatment technology for producing hank yarn without a dyeing speck. This invention provides a processor for the liquid ammonia treatment of hank yarn and a method, wherein liquid ammonia is supplied to cellulose fibers, liquid ammonia is removed from the hank yarn, the hank yarn is placed under a pressure reduced condition, hot water or steam is supplied to the hank yarn, and the hank yarn is placed under the pressure reduced condition again. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/08 (2006.01); D06B 7/06 (2006.01); D06B 19/00 (2006.01); D06M 11/61 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/08 (2013.01); D06B 7/06 (2013.01); D06B 19/00 (2013.01); D06M 11/61 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057919 A2 20001206; EP 1057919 A3 20011010

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020411

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI