Global patent index - EP 1057925 A2

EP 1057925 A2 2000-12-06 - Printing process on a transparent or semi-transparent open-mesh fabric and product obtained

Title (en)

Printing process on a transparent or semi-transparent open-mesh fabric and product obtained

Title (de)

Druckverfahren für ein offenmaschiges transparentes oder halbtransparentes Gewebe und das damit hergestellte Produkt

Title (fr)

Procédé d'impression d'un tissu à mailles ouvertes transparent ou semi-transparent et produit ainsi obtenu

Publication

EP 1057925 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500114 A

Priority

ES 9901310 A

Abstract (en)

It comprises an inflation embossment technique and the application of embossment auxiliary thickening paste producing the wrinkled embossment, the embossing paste comprising from 40 to 50% of weigh of solid contents and a viscosity ranging from 15000 to 45000 centipoises (CP), being resistant to temperatures of up to 180 DEG C and allowing preforming, its application being carried out with a distribution ranging from 10 to 40 grams per square metre. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06Q 1/08; A41B 17/00; D06M 15/705

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 17/00 (2006.01); D06M 15/705 (2006.01); D06Q 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41B 17/00 (2013.01); D06M 15/705 (2013.01); D06Q 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057925 A2 20001206; EP 1057925 A3 20031008; ES 2173011 A1 20021001; ES 2173011 B1 20031216

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-07-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7D 06Q 1/08 A

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7D 06M 15/705 B

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 41B 17/00 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI