Global patent index - EP 1057935 A1

EP 1057935 A1 2000-12-06 - Paving stone

Title (en)

Paving stone

Title (de)

Pflasterstein

Title (fr)

Pierre à paver

Publication

EP 1057935 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110732 A

Priority

EP 99110732 A

Abstract (en)

The block (10) has a first pair of spacers (19,20) on two opposite sides (13), and a second pair of spacers (17,18) on the other opposite sides. Spacers within a pair of offset relative to each by one spacer width, so that their sides engage with spacers of a neighboring block. The first pair is offset relative to a line (15) cutting across the block. The second pair is offset relative to a line (16), which is offset relative to the cross line by one spacer width (b).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Pflasterstein mit einer parallel zueinander verlaufenden Oberseite (2) und Unterseite sowie vier rechtwinklig hierzu verlaufenden Seitenflächen (3) beschrieben. An den Seitenflächen (3) sind seitlich vorstehende Abstandshalter (6-9) angeordnet, die mit Abstandshaltern von benachbarten Pflastersteinen zur Ausbildung von Fugen in seitliche Anlage treten. Die Abstandshalter (6-9) sind so angeordnet, daß sich eine Vielzahl von Verlegemustern im Vollverbund erreichen läßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/06 (2013.01); E01C 2201/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057935 A1 20001206; EP 1057935 B1 20040526; AT 267917 T 20040615; DE 59909591 D1 20040701

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909591

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120809

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080101

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INNOCON G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-07-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909591

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE NL

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020730

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE NL

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE NL

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI