Global Patent Index - EP 1057946 A2

EP 1057946 A2 2000-12-06 - Wall and shuttering element for the construction of walls, specially for swimming pool walls

Title (en)

Wall and shuttering element for the construction of walls, specially for swimming pool walls

Title (de)

Mauer- und Schalungselement zum Errichten von Wänden, insbesondere für Schwimmbeckenummauerungen

Title (fr)

Elément de mur et de coffrage pour la réalisation de murs, particulièrement pour murs de bassins de natation

Publication

EP 1057946 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109731 A

Priority

DE 29909486 U

Abstract (en)

A shuttering element (1) for producing walls, especially for a swimming pool, comprises primary and secondary longitudinal walls (23) and primary and secondary end walls (3, 4), which surround a mold chamber. The free edges of the walls form connection sections on one side of the chamber and a corresponding connection on the other, so two or more elements can be placed together. The element has a layer (40) on at least one outer surface which is of a different material to that of the shuttering element.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Mauer- und Schalungselement zum Errichten von Wänden, insbesondere von Schwimmbeckenummauerungen mit einer ersten Längswandung, einer zweiten Längswandung, einer ersten Endquerwandung und einer zweiten Endquerwandung, welche zumindest eine Gießkammer umgrenzen, wobei die freien Kanten der Wandungen auf einer Seite der Gießkammer ein Steckgesicht und an der gegenüberliegenden zweiten Seite der Gießkammern ein korrespondierendes Gegensteckgesicht aufweisen, so daß zwei oder mehrere Mauer- und Schalungselemente formschlüssig zusammensteckbar sind, wobei die Wandungen Oberflächen der herzustellenden Mauer bildende Flachaußenseiten aufweisen, wobei das Mauer- und Schalungselement an zumindest einer Flachaußenseite eine Schicht vorbestimmbarer Dicke mit einer Materialgüte aufweist, welche von der Materialgüte des übrigen Mauer- und Schalungselements verschieden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/86; E04H 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/86 (2006.01); E04H 4/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/8629 (2013.01); E04H 4/0081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29909486 U1 19990812; EP 1057946 A2 20001206; EP 1057946 A3 20030507

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20031202

2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031108

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

SI

- Payment date: 20000508

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000508