Global Patent Index - EP 1057949 A1

EP 1057949 A1 2000-12-06 - ENCLOSURE FOR SIGNAL REPEATER

Title (en)

ENCLOSURE FOR SIGNAL REPEATER

Title (de)

EINFRIEDUNG FÜR SIGNALVERSTÄRKER

Title (fr)

ENCEINTE POUR REPETEUR DE SIGNAUX

Publication

EP 1057949 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99904888 A

Priority

  • ES 9900044 W
  • ES 9800501 U

Abstract (en)

The enclosure is delimited by a fence and has inside a tower (2) which supports an antenna (14), as well as a housing (1) which contains the emission and reception equipments. It is characterized in that three of the external walls of the housing (1) are in contact with the fence (3) and the other external face of the housing (1) is separated by a certain distance from the fence (3) section which is parallel to said external wall; this configuration defines a space wherein the tower (2) is located while leaving a free space between the housing (1), the tower (2) and the fence (3). Within said free space are included the door giving access to the housing (5) and the door giving access to the enclosure (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 5/02; E04H 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 5/02 (2006.01); E04H 12/20 (2006.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 5/02 (2013.01); E04H 12/20 (2013.01); H01Q 1/1242 (2013.01); H01Q 1/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942684A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057949 A1 20001206; EP 1057949 B1 20030122; ES 1039543 U 19981216; ES 1039543 Y 19990516; PT 1057949 E 20030630; WO 9942684 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080819

2008-09-01 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080819

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-09 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR PT

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR PT