Global Patent Index - EP 1057950 A2

EP 1057950 A2 2000-12-06 - Device for coupling two construction elements

Title (en)

Device for coupling two construction elements

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für das Verbinden zweier Bauteile

Title (fr)

Dispositif de liaison de deux éléments de construction

Publication

EP 1057950 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112049 A

Priority

  • DE 29909731 U
  • DE 20002501 U

Abstract (en)

The first construction element, e.g. column, is supported against the connection fitting or its base surface (53) in order to prevent the base surface tilting under load. The fitting includes a base surface with a bore (48) for receiving an anchor element (4) also used to transfer stress from the first construction element into the second construction element, e.g. foundation. The fitting or its base surface are joined to load-receiving rods (32). Independent claims are also included for (a) a support foot containing two or more of these fittings, and (b) constructions, especially halls with beams resting on supports on foundations, these optionally pre-fabricated concrete parts being joined together using the connection fitting or support foot.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung für das Verbinden zweier Bauteile, zum Beispiel eines Pfostens und eines Fundamentes. Die Vorrichtung besitzt dabei eine Grundfläche mit Bohrung. In die Bohrung greift ein Haltemittel ein. An der Vorrichtung sind ein oder mehrere Lastaufnahmestäbe angeordnet. Es wird vorgeschlagen, das Bauteil neben einer Abstützung über die Lastaufnahmestäbe auch selbst an der Vorrichtung beziehungsweise an der Grundfläche abzustützen, derart, daß keine Verkippung der Grundfläche bei Belastung erfolgt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/21 (2006.01); E04H 12/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/215 (2013.01); E04H 12/2261 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057950 A2 20001206; EP 1057950 A3 20011017; EP 1057950 B1 20080806; AT 403789 T 20080815; DE 10027037 A1 20001214; DE 10027037 B4 20091022; DE 20002501 U1 20001207; DE 50015295 D1 20080918; DK 1057950 T3 20081201; ES 2311445 T3 20090216

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160602

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080806

2011-04-06 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20101127

2010-01-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-08-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PEIKKO FINLAND OY

2009-06-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PEIKKO FINLAND OY

- Effective date: 20090504

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2311445 T3

2008-12-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-11-14 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080402885

2008-10-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT

2008-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015295 P 20080918

2008-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040416

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020417

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04H 12/22 A, 7E 04B 1/21 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI