Global patent index - EP 1057951 A1

EP 1057951 A1 2000-12-06 - Locking mechanism comprising a cylinder lock and a key for such a lock

Title (en)

Locking mechanism comprising a cylinder lock and a key for such a lock

Title (de)

Aus Schliesszylinder und zugehörigem Schlüssel bestehende Schliessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage comportant une serrure cylindrique et une clé pour une telle serrure

Publication

EP 1057951 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105780 A

Priority

  • DE 19921454 A
  • DE 10000194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6374654B1] Locking arrangement having a lock cylinder with an associated key (1), in particular a flat turning key, wherein a core (2) of the lock cylinder has a keyway (3) which is open in the direction of an end side of the cylinder, is provided with profile ribs/grooves and in the center thereof the vertex of a conical opening (4), which opens in the direction of the end side of the cylinder, is located. At an insertion end, the key (1) forms a tip (5) with flanks (6) in the form of arcuate lines. The tip (5) is formed by two arcuate lines (6), of which a point of intersection is located in a broad-side center (7) of the key, and a tangent angle (delta) at the point of intersection (5) is greater than the vertex angle (mu) of the cone opening (4), wherein the arcuate lines (6) have bevels (9), in the direction of the mutually opposite broad sides (8), having a bevel angle (omega) which is smaller than the vertex angle (mu) of the cone opening (4).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schließvorrichtung mit Schließzylinder mit zugehörigem Schlüssel (1), insbesondere Wende-Flachschlüssel, wobei der Zylinderkern (2) des Schließzylinders einen zur Zylinderstirnseite hin offenen, mit Profilrippen/-nuten versehenen Schlüsselkanal (3) besitzt, in dessen Mitte die Spitze einer zur Zylinderstirnseite sich öffnenden konischen Öffnung (4) liegt, wobei der Schlüssel (1) an seinem einsteckseitigen Ende eine Spitze (5) mit bogenlinienförmigen Flanken (6) ausbildet. Zur Erleichterung des Einführens des Schlüssels in den Schlüsselkanal ist vorgesehen, daß die Spitze (5) von zwei Bogenlinien (6) gebildet ist, deren Schnittpunkt in der Schlüsselbreitseitenmitte (7) liegt, und der Tangentenwinkel (Delta) im Schnittpunkt (5) größer ist als der Öffnungswinkel (My) der Konusöffnung (4), wobei die Bogenlinien (6) zu den sich gegenüberliegenden Breitseiten (8) Fasen (9) aufweisen mit einem Fasenwinkel (Omega), der kleiner ist als der Öffnungswinkel (My) der Konusöffnung (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/08 (2006.01); E05B 19/00 (2006.01); E05B 19/06 (2006.01); E05B 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/08 (2013.01); E05B 19/0017 (2013.01); Y10T 70/787 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7881 (2015.04); Y10T 70/8595 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6374654 B1 20020423; AT 217934 T 20020615; CA 2307795 A1 20001108; CA 2307795 C 20080115; CN 1153879 C 20040616; CN 1274037 A 20001122; CZ 20001634 A3 20001213; CZ 298307 B6 20070822; DK 1057951 T3 20020916; EP 1057951 A1 20001206; EP 1057951 B1 20020522; ES 2173835 T3 20021101; HK 1029824 A1 20041224; NL 1014746 C1 20001109; PL 196927 B1 20080229; PL 339993 A1 20001120; PT 1057951 E 20021031

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160301

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160314

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160314

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160314

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160314

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160314

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: C.ED. SCHULTE GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER H, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50000175

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111103

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50000175

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RIEDER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSANWALT, DE

- Effective date: 20111103

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50000175

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RIEDER & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20111103

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173835

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-10-09 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020402485

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-09-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-09-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000175

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-27

2002-06-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 217934

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI