Global patent index - EP 1057959 A2

EP 1057959 A2 2000-12-06 - Check for window wings or ventilation flaps

Title (en)

Check for window wings or ventilation flaps

Title (de)

Ausstellvorrichtung für Fensterflügel oder Lüftungsklappen

Title (fr)

Dispositif déflecteur pour battants de fenêtres ou volets de ventilation

Publication

EP 1057959 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104948 A

Priority

CH 101899 A

Abstract (en)

An electric motor (3) through a bi-directional chain drive (6) linked to a fork connector (7) operates an opening and closing spring (10) loaded link (8a). This runs in a sleeve (9) and is connected to the window casement (2). A second part of the link (8c) passes through a hole in the casement frame to engage in a locking mechanism through guide rollers (19,20) these slide in angled guides (21,22) to actuate locking bars (12,14)

Abstract (de)

Die Ausstellvorrichtung weist ein Ausstell-Mechanismus (7 - 10) auf, mit dem der Fenster-Flügel (2) in eine Lüftungsstellung geöffnet und von dieser wieder geschlossen werden kann. Dieser beinhaltet eine Schubstange (8) deren eines Ende mit einer Umlenkeinrichtung (13) und deren anderes Ende, z.B. über einen Anschluss-Winkel (7), mit einem Antrieb verbunden ist. Beim Antrieb, der am Fenster-Rahmen anzuordnen ist, handelt es sich vorzugsweise um einen Elektromotor mit Treibkette. Durch die Umlenkeinrichtung (13) wird die Hubbewegung (23) der Schubstange in eine Hubbewegung (24, 25) eines Treibstangenverschlusses (14, 15) mit einer Mehrzahl von Verriegelungsstellen umgelenkt. Dank dieser einfachen Ausstellvorrichtung kann mit einem einzigen Elektromotor das Fenster sowohl geöffnet und geschlossen werden als auch der Treibstangenverschluss (14, 15) betätigt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/12; E05B 47/00; E05C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01); E05C 9/24 (2006.01); E05F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/045 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05F 15/619 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0016 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/10 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/656 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/724 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057959 A2 20001206; EP 1057959 A3 20040526; CH 693456 A5 20030815

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041127

2005-03-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2005-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05F 15/12 A

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05B 47/00 B

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/04 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI