Global Patent Index - EP 1057960 A2

EP 1057960 A2 2000-12-06 - Actuating device

Title (en)

Actuating device

Title (de)

Stellvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de manoeuvre

Publication

EP 1057960 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108921 A

Priority

DE 19925741 A

Abstract (en)

The actuator has a spindle drive (18) operated by a servo motor (14). The drive consists of a spindle (24) with outer thread (26) enclosed by a sleeve part (20,28) with inner thread (30) engaging with the outer thread. One of the two threads consists of two separate thread parts (32,36). An elastic pre-tensionable element (38) such as O ring produces axial force between the two threaded parts.

Abstract (de)

Eine Stellvorrichtung dient zum Verfahren eines beweglichen Teils in verschiedene Stellungen, beispielsweise eines Seitenausstellfensters eines Kraftfahrzeuges. Ein Stellmotor (14) treibt einen Spindeltrieb (18) an, der im wesentlichen aus einer Spindel (24) mit einem Außengewinde (26) und einem diese umgebenden Hülsenteil (28) mit einem entsprechenden Innengewinde (30) besteht. Axiales Spiel im Bereich des Spindeltriebes (18) kann bei äußerer Krafteinwirkung zu Geräuschentwicklungen führen, zu deren Vermeidung vorgeschlagen wird, daß eines der beiden Gewinde (30) aus getrennten Gewindeteilen (32, 36) besteht und ein elastisch vorspannbares Element (38) vorgesehen ist, mit Hilfe dessen zwischen den beiden Gewindeteilen (32, 36) eine Axialkraft erzeugbar ist. Durch die Axialkraft liegen die beiden Gewindeteile (32, 36) jeweils an entgegengesetzten Flanken des Außengewindes (26) an, so daß das axiale Gewindespiel aufgehoben wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/622 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/422 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4186524 A 19800205 - PELCHAT PAUL F [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057960 A2 20001206; EP 1057960 A3 20021204; EP 1057960 B1 20041201; DE 19925741 A1 20001207; US 6418666 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50008801

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50008801

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100427

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-11-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008801

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05F 15/12 A, 7E 05F 15/14 B

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI