Global Patent Index - EP 1057961 A2

EP 1057961 A2 2000-12-06 - Threshold for housedoor and the housedoor

Title (en)

Threshold for housedoor and the housedoor

Title (de)

Schwellenprofil für Gebäudetüren sowie Gebäudetür

Title (fr)

Seuil pour porte de maison ainsi que porte de maison

Publication

EP 1057961 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111378 A

Priority

  • DE 29909401 U
  • DE 20004350 U
  • DE 20009185 U

Abstract (en)

The threshold profile for a building door (6) is made of plastics and is formed with an integral reinforcement to increase its inner profile load bearing capacity. A further reinforcement strengthens the outer profile section. A middle profile section connects the inner and outer sections. A cover (2) can be mounted on the upper section of the profile.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schwellenprofil (6) für Gebäude oder Gebäudefenstertüren, insbesondere Hebeschiebetüren (2) ist aus Kunststoff gefertigt. An der Oberseite des Schwellenprofils (6) ist wenigstens eine Schwellenabdeckung (22A) befestigt, die mit einem plattenartigen Profilabschnitt (23A') die Oberseite des Schwellenprofils (6) zumindest teilweise abdeckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/70; E06B 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/56 (2006.01); E06B 1/70 (2006.01); E06B 3/46 (2006.01); E06B 3/52 (2006.01); E05D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/4636 (2013.01); E05D 15/565 (2013.01); E06B 1/70 (2013.01); E06B 3/4618 (2013.01); E06B 3/52 (2013.01); E05D 15/0686 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E06B 2001/707 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 7908753 U1 19790705

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057961 A2 20001206; EP 1057961 A3 20011219; EP 1057961 B1 20050126; AT 288019 T 20050215; DK 1057961 T3 20050517; ES 2235713 T3 20050716

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-09-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070222

2007-06-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-27 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070222

2007-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070514

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ROTO FRANK AG

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROTO FRANK AG

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-08-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-08-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235713 T3

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-26 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-05-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-05-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-04-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-04-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009326 P 20050303

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030528

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020121

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI