Global Patent Index - EP 1057964 A3

EP 1057964 A3 2001-12-12 - Corner joint for windows

Title (en)

Corner joint for windows

Title (de)

Eckverbinder für Fenster

Title (fr)

Raccord d'angle pour fenêtres

Publication

EP 1057964 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00890177 A

Priority

AT 99199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1057964A2] The corner connector (5) has two pegs (6) at right angles to each other and which can be inserted into the glass cover-strips being joined. Where the two pegs meet, an arm (7) protrudes at under 45 degrees onto each peg from the plane formed by one of the two pegs. The surface of the covering surface (8) facing the glass-strips is spaced apart from the pegs by a distance corresponding to the shape and thickness of the walls of the glass strips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/964; E06B 3/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5885 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057964 A2 20001206; EP 1057964 A3 20011212; AT 408124 B 20010925; AT A99199 A 20010115; HU 0002131 A2 20010328; HU 0002131 A3 20020328; HU 0002131 D0 20000828; HU 221914 B1 20030228; PL 340416 A1 20001204

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050903

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050422

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020612

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI