Global Patent Index - EP 1057966 A1

EP 1057966 A1 2000-12-06 - Tiltable shutter with a locking device on an end rail

Title (en)

Tiltable shutter with a locking device on an end rail

Title (de)

Raff-Lamellenstore mit einer Blockiervorrichtung an einer Endschiene

Title (fr)

Store basculant avec dispositif de blockage sur un rail final

Publication

EP 1057966 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810420 A

Priority

CH 105799 A

Abstract (en)

The end rail (1), at a distance away from its two ends, is fixed to a winder-band (19), with a locking member each (13,14) tensioned by springs (16). When the end rail is in its lowest end position, it cooperates with a counter element (26) preventing the end rail from sliding upwards. Each winder band leads over a deflector element (23) fixed to the end rail. Both sides of the end rail are guided by sleeves (7) in vertical profiles (9). The locking elements comprise bolts sliding inside the sleeves.

Abstract (de)

Die Endschiene (1) ist benachbart ihren beiden Enden an Aufzugsbändern (19) befestigt, welche Öffnungen der übereinander angeordneten Lamellen durchgreifen und oben auf drehbaren Trommeln aufgewickelt sind. Die Endschiene (1) weist beidseitig ein Verriegelungsglied (13, 14) auf, das in der unteren Endlage der Endschiene (1) in ein Gegenglied (26) eingreift. Die Verriegelungsglieder (13, 14) sind durch Federn (16) in die ausgefahrene Stellung vorbelastet. Die Aufzugsbänder (19) sind um je ein an der Endschiene (1) befestigtes Umlenkorgan (23) geführt und an je einem der Verriegelungsglieder (13, 14) befestigt. Bei Zug an den Aufzugsbändern (19) werden zunächst die Verriegelungsglieder (13, 14) in ihre eingefahrene Stellung bewegt, bevor die Endschiene (1) angehoben wird. Durch die beschriebene Vorrichtung wird eine automatische Verriegelung der Endschiene (1) sowohl in horizontaler wie auch in vertikaler Lage in ihrer unteren Endstellung erreicht, was ein manuelles Hochschieben der Store von aussen erschwert. Dadurch wird die Einbruchssicherheit verbessert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/86 (2006.01); E06B 9/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/86 (2013.01); E06B 2009/805 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057966 A1 20001206; EP 1057966 B1 20041027; AT 280889 T 20041115; CH 693575 A5 20031015; DE 50008382 D1 20041202; DK 1057966 T3 20041206

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-10-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008382

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI

2004-05-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: TILTABLE SHUTTER WITH A LOCKING DEVICE ON AN END RAIL

2004-04-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: TILTABLE SHUTTER WITH A LOCKING DEVICE ON AN END RAIL

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030320

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE DK FR IT LI

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010602

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI