Global patent index - EP 1058001 A1

EP 1058001 A1 2000-12-06 - High pressure feed pump

Title (en)

High pressure feed pump

Title (de)

Hochdruckförderpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe d'alimentation haute pression

Publication

EP 1058001 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109323 A

Priority

CH 101399 A

Abstract (en)

The pump has a cylinder (8) with piston (9), a drive shaft (3) with eccentric (6) supporting a rolling ring (7). The ring has two apertures/recesses located in its outer wall, axially outside and on either side of the contact surface (16) between ring and piston. The aperture has an approx. rectangular cross section. The surface of the ring is curved.

Abstract (de)

Eine Hochdruckförderpumpe mit einem Hochdruckzylinder (8) und einem darin verschiebbaren Förderkolben (9) weist einen auf eine Antriebswelle (3) angeordneten Exzenter (6) auf, auf dem ein Abwälzring (7, 7') drehbar gelagert ist, an dem der Förderkolben (9) über eine Kontaktfläche (16) anliegt. Der Abwälzring (7') weist am Aussenumfang zumindest eine Ausnehmung (20, 22) oder Aussparung auf. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/10; F04B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F04B 9/02 (2006.01); F04B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 9/045 (2013.01); F02M 59/102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058001 A1 20001206; EP 1058001 B1 20050216; DE 50009529 D1 20050324; ES 2233236 T3 20050616; JP 2000356184 A 20001226; JP 3609693 B2 20050112; US 6205980 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110503

2013-07-02 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130702

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051117

2006-01-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2233236

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050404

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009529

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040122

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CRT COMMON RAIL TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI