Global Patent Index - EP 1058006 A1

EP 1058006 A1 2000-12-06 - DIAPHRAGM PUMP

Title (en)

DIAPHRAGM PUMP

Title (de)

MEMBRANPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE A MEMBRANE

Publication

EP 1058006 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905210 A

Priority

  • JP 9900685 W
  • JP 3469098 A

Abstract (en)

A diaphragm pump, in which a working fluid control valve (D) opens a working fluid make-up passage (B24) to prevent a diaphragm (C) from being damaged when an excessive discharge pressure acts on the diaphragm. The working fluid control valve (D) for opening and closing the working fluid make-up passage (B24) is provided with a valve disc formed to be capable of reciprocating relative to the diaphragm (C) in a valve disc receiving chamber (B2) to close an opening of the valve disc receiving chamber (B2), means for biasing the valve disc toward the diaphragm, and means for closing the working fluid make-up passage (B24) when a distance, over which the valve disc extends from the opening of the valve disc receiving chamber, exceeds a predetermined value. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/02 (2006.01); F04B 43/067 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/0081 (2013.01); F04B 43/02 (2013.01); F04B 43/067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058006 A1 20001206; EP 1058006 A4 20060802; EP 1058006 B1 20120912; EP 2241756 A2 20101020; ES 2393276 T3 20121220; JP 4372346 B2 20091125; US 6481982 B1 20021119; WO 9941502 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170110

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-10 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69944398

- Effective date: 20130613

2013-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130613

2012-12-20 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2393276 T3

- Effective date: 20121220

2012-11-08 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69944398

- Effective date: 20121108

2012-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2012-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070123

2006-08-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060630

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT