Global patent index - EP 1058009 A1

EP 1058009 A1 2000-12-06 - IMPROVEMENTS TO ULTRACOMPACT AIR EXTRACTORS FOR BATHROOMS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS TO ULTRACOMPACT AIR EXTRACTORS FOR BATHROOMS

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE ULTRAKOMPAKTE LUFTABZÜGE FÜR BADEZIMMER

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES AUX SYSTEMES D'EVACUATION ULTRACOMPACTS DE SALLES DE BAIN

Publication

EP 1058009 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922194 A

Priority

  • ES 9900158 W
  • ES 9802610 A

Abstract (en)

The improvements are basically made in the systems for shutting the extractor fan s tunnel when same is in an idle position and which object is that of avoiding, as a consequence of the temeprature s differential between the outside and the interior, the raising of air draughts, as well as to the protection of certain electric and electronic elements, as well as to the attachment system of the extractor fan to the vertical faces or any other support element used in the room where it is installed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 25/12; F04D 29/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/12 (2006.01); F04D 25/14 (2006.01); F04D 29/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/14 (2013.01); F04D 25/12 (2013.01); F04D 29/646 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0036304A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058009 A1 20001206; EP 1058009 B1 20041201; AR 019652 A1 20020313; AU 3933199 A 20000703; AU 756033 B2 20030102; BR 9907245 A 20001017; DE 69922349 D1 20050105; DE 69922349 T2 20051215; ES 2155362 A1 20010501; ES 2155362 B1 20020316; PT 1058009 E 20050331; WO 0036304 A1 20000622

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160609

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160601

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-09-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69922349

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030905

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT