Global Patent Index - EP 1058011 A1

EP 1058011 A1 2000-12-06 - Multiple-way valve

Title (en)

Multiple-way valve

Title (de)

Wegeventil

Title (fr)

Distributeur

Publication

EP 1058011 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110785 A

Priority

DE 19925371 A

Abstract (en)

The path valve (10) has a housing (12) with bore (14) for a valve slide (16), and an actuator unit (18) to charge the slide against the force of a return unit (26). Elements are provided to transmit the force of the return unit and of the actuator unit, to a common contact point on the valve slide. The point is formed by the end of the slide facing the return flow (34). The elements are an axial bore (40) in the slide, and a support element (46) projecting into it. The bore opening is located in the slide end away from the return flow.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Wegeventil (10) mit einem in einer Schieberbohrung (14) geführten und von einer Betätigungseinrichtung (18) entgegen der Kraft einer Rückstelleinrichtung (26) betätigbaren Ventilschieber (16) vorgeschlagen, dessen konstruktive Ausgestaltung einen vom Lastdruck unabhängigen Strom von Druckmittel ermöglicht. Dazu wird der Ventilschieber (16) mit Mitteln ausgestattet, die den Angriffspunkt der Rückstelleinrichtung (26) und den der Betätigungseinrichtung (18) auf ein gemeinsames Ende des Ventilschiebers (16) übertragen. Dieses gemeinsame Ende liegt dem Rücklauf (34) des Wegeventils (10) zugewandt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/043

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 13/044 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0402 (2013.01); F15B 13/0442 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058011 A1 20001206; EP 1058011 B1 20031022; DE 19925371 A1 20001207

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100520

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080728

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070520

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070520

2006-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040204

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004132 P 20031127

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI