Global Patent Index - EP 1058048 A2

EP 1058048 A2 2000-12-06 - Plastic cover lens for motor vehicle headlamps and lamps

Title (en)

Plastic cover lens for motor vehicle headlamps and lamps

Title (de)

Kunststoffscheibe von Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfern und Kraftfahrzeugleuchten

Title (fr)

Couvercle diffuseur en matière plastique pour projecteurs et feux de véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 1058048 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111531 A

Priority

DE 19925049 A

Abstract (en)

The plastic disk for motor vehicle headlights and other lights is provided on its inner side with a transparent coating which prevents inhomogeneous accumulation of dust and resultant stain formation on it.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist eine Kunststoffscheibe von Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfern oder Kraftfahrzeugleuchten. Die Kunststoffscheibe ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Scheibe auf der dem Leuchtmittel zugewandten Oberfläche eine transparente Beschichtung zur Vermeidung von Fleckenbildung durch inhomogene Staubablagerung aufweist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 1/10; C23C 16/40; F21V 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 3/04 (2013.01); F21S 48/1233 (2013.01); F21S 48/2212 (2013.01); F21S 48/30 (2013.01); F21S 48/31 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058048 A2 20001206; EP 1058048 A3 20040630; DE 19925049 A1 20001207; DE 19925049 C2 20030522; DE 19925049 C5 20051222; US 6394635 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080709

2008-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080227

2005-09-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

2005-03-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

2005-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20041204

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 02B 1/10 A

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 21V 3/04 B

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 23C 16/40 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI