Global Patent Index - EP 1058049 A2

EP 1058049 A2 2000-12-06 - Electric light

Title (en)

Electric light

Title (de)

Elektrische Leuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe électrique

Publication

EP 1058049 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109682 A

Priority

DE 19924737 A

Abstract (en)

The light fitting has a console (1) attached to a ceiling or wall surface, supporting at least one lamp head with a tubular carrier (2) and a relatively pivoted spotlamp (4). The tubular carrier fits into a socket provided by the console, provided on its inside with a tube (5) of given length and an inner cylinder (6) received within the end of the tubular carrier, having a peripheral retaining edge (6.2) cooperating with a retaining lip (2.2) on the inside of the latter, for holding a flange (2.1) of the tubular carrier against a stop surface provided by the socket tube.

Abstract (de)

Eine elektrische Leuchte mit einer Leuchtenkonsole, an der mindestens ein Leuchtenkopf befestigt ist. Der Leuchtenkopf besitzt einen rohrförmigen Träger (2), an dem über ein Gelenk (3) ein Strahler (4) angeordnet ist. Der Träger (2) ist mit seinem freien Ende in eine Öffnung der Leuchtenkonsole (1) eingesteckt und in ihr befestigt. An der Innenseite der Öffnung ist ein in die Leuchtenkonsole (1) hineingeführter Tubus (5) vorgegebener Länge angeordnet, der einstückig und materialeinheitlich mit der Leuchtenkonsole (1) verbunden ist. Der Träger (2) besitzt im Bereich seines freien Endes an der Außenseite einen Trägerflansch (2.1), der sich im eingesteckten Zustand an die Leuchtenkonsole (1) anlegt. Im Inneren des Trägers (2) sind Rastmittel (2.2) angeordnet. Als Befestigungselement dient ein von der Innenseite der Leuchtenkonsole (1) her in den eingesteckten Träger (2) einsteckbarer Stopfen (6), der an seinem inneren Ende mit Rastgegenmitteln (6.2) versehen ist, die mit den Rastmitteln (2.2) des Trägers zusammenwirken. Am äußeren Ende des Stopfens (6) befindet sich ein Stopfenflansch (6.1), der sich nach dem Einstecken und Einrasten des Stopfens (6) an das Ende des Tubus (5) und/oder des Trägers (2) anlegt derart, daß der Träger (2) zwischen dem Trägerflansch (2.1) und dem Stopfenflansch (6.1) in axialer Richtung festgelegt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/14 (2006.01); F21V 21/30 (2006.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/04 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/30 (2013.01); F21S 8/033 (2013.01); F21S 8/04 (2013.01); F21V 19/00 (2013.01); F21V 21/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058049 A2 20001206; EP 1058049 A3 20030507; DE 19924737 A1 20001214; DE 19924737 C2 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031203

2004-03-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI