Global Patent Index - EP 1058051 A1

EP 1058051 A1 2000-12-06 - FLUIDIZED BED GASIFICATION FURNACE

Title (en)

FLUIDIZED BED GASIFICATION FURNACE

Title (de)

WIRBELSCHICHTBETTVERGASUNGSOFEN

Title (fr)

FOUR DE GAZEIFICATION A LIT FLUIDISE

Publication

EP 1058051 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906525 A

Priority

  • JP 9900946 W
  • JP 6188698 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a fluidized-bed gasification furnace which can rapidly discharge incombustibles contained in a fuel, together with a fluidized medium. The fluidized-bed gasification furnace utilizes a fluidized-bed reactor and comprises a discharge port (16) provided in the vicinity of the floor in a fluidized bed for discharging a fluidized medium and connected to a fluidized medium discharge chutes (20a to 20d) extending downwardly, and a gas blow device (13) provided below the chutes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 10/00; F23G 5/027; F23G 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 10/24 (2006.01); F23G 5/027 (2006.01); F23G 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 10/24 (2013.01); F23G 5/027 (2013.01); F23G 5/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058051 A1 20001206; EP 1058051 A4 20010919; EP 1058051 B1 20050720; AU 2641999 A 19990915; CN 1239841 C 20060201; CN 1295661 A 20010516; DE 69926217 D1 20050825; DE 69926217 T2 20060420; WO 9943985 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-01-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69926217

- Effective date: 20130903

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110226

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110226

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110226

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100202

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2006-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-09-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69926217 P 20050825

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 23C 10/00 A

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 23G 5/30 B

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 23G 5/027 B

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2001-09-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT