Global Patent Index - EP 1058052 A1

EP 1058052 A1 2000-12-06 - Liquid fuel burner with low NOx and dust emission and atomizer therefor

Title (en)

Liquid fuel burner with low NOx and dust emission and atomizer therefor

Title (de)

Brenner für flüssige Brennstoffe mit niedriger NOx- und Staubemission und Düse dafür

Title (fr)

Brûleur à combustible liquide à basse émission de NOx et de poussières et atomiseur associé

Publication

EP 1058052 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00430024 A

Priority

FR 9907030 A

Abstract (en)

The burner is in the form of a tube with an end or head connected to fuel and auxiliary atomising fluid feed ducts, a detachable atomiser and a carrier with a number of jets. The atomiser (1) is in one piece, has guides (8) for the auxiliary atomising fluid, and recesses (10, 11) in its opposite faces around a central orifice (2). The recess (11) in one face has a truncated conical shape and is linked to the inner ends of tangential grooves (9). An outer annular rib (15) separates the centre of the atomiser from a ring of holes (3) carrying the auxiliary fluid, which passes through guide channels (8) to the recess (10) in the opposite face.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058052 A1 20001206; EP 1058052 B1 20040519; DE 60010798 D1 20040624; DE 60010798 T2 20050609; ES 2219285 T3 20041201; FR 2794221 A1 20001201; FR 2794221 B1 20010824; US 6425755 B1 20020730

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-06-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160627

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2013-01-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20130110

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110530

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60010798

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2219285

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60010798

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

RO

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-08-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20010322

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010322

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI