Global patent index - EP 1058082 A3

EP 1058082 A3 2001-01-24 - Land mine clearing device

Title (en)

Land mine clearing device

Title (de)

Minenräumgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de déminage

Publication

EP 1058082 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00890176 A

Priority

AT 98799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1058082A2] The mine clearing device is provided by an armoured vehicle with a driven roller (3) provided with peripheral lifting blades (4), positioned adjacent spring-loaded rails (7) for explosion of the lifted mines, which can be adjusted via a hydraulic setting device, e.g. a setting cylinder (10), with an expansion space within the hydraulic circuit for reception of the pressure wave caused by an explosion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 11/16 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 11/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058082 A2 20001206; EP 1058082 A3 20010124; AT 407572 B 20010425; AT A98799 A 20000815; US 6371001 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI