Global patent index - EP 1058084 A2

EP 1058084 A2 2000-12-06 - Fireworks rocket

Title (en)

Fireworks rocket

Title (de)

Feuerwerksrakete

Title (fr)

Roquette munie de charge de feu d'artifice

Publication

EP 1058084 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111565 A

Priority

DE 29909504 U

Abstract (en)

The rocket has a head and a sleeve (2) containing a propulsion device. The head (3) of the rocket has at least two sleeve sections (4,5) which project out horizontally from the head.

Abstract (de)

Die Feuerwerksrakete weist einen Kopf (3) und eine sich daran anschließende schlanke Treibsatzhülse (2) auf, wobei in der Treibsatzhülse eine Treibladung (6) und am Heck eine Düse (7) sowie im Kopf (3) mehrere durch eine Ausstoßladung (13) ausstoßbare Effektsätze (16) vorgesehen sind. Zum Erzielen besonderer Effekte weist der Kopf (3) der Feuerwerksrakete (1) zumindest zwei im wesentlichen quer von der Treibsatzhülse (2) wegragende Hülsenteile (4, 5, 19) auf. In jedem Hülsenteil sind Effektsätze (16) angeordnet, die im wesentlichen in Richtung der Längsachse der Hülsenteile (4, 5, 19) quer zur Treibsatzhülse (2) ausgestoßen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 4/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 4/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 4/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058084 A2 20001206; EP 1058084 A3 20020612

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021213

2003-04-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 42B 4/10 A, 7F 42B 4/06 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI