Global Patent Index - EP 1058165 A1

EP 1058165 A1 2000-12-06 - A direct electrostatic printing device wherein charged toner particles are brought proximate to a printhead structure using an electrostatic powder spray gun

Title (en)

A direct electrostatic printing device wherein charged toner particles are brought proximate to a printhead structure using an electrostatic powder spray gun

Title (de)

Direkte elektrostatische Druckvorrichtung mit Zufuhr von aufgeladenen Tonerteilchen in der Nähe einer Druckkopfstruktur mittels einer elektrostatische Pulversprühpistole

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression électrostatique directe où les particules de toner chargées sont amenées à proximité de la structure d'impression à l'aide d'un pistolet de pulvérisation électrostatique de poudre

Publication

EP 1058165 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99201790 A

Priority

EP 99201790 A

Abstract (en)

A direct electrostatic printing device is described wherein the means for providing a stream of charged toner particles (106) proximate to a printhead structure (102) comprises an electrostatic powder spray gun (105). Two embodiments are disclosed, one wherein the flow of toner particles towards the image receiving member (109) is directly generated from the spray gun and one wherein the spray gun is used to apply a layer of charged toner particles on a conveyor for charged toner particles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/346 (2013.01); G03G 2217/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058165 A1 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010607

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI