Global Patent Index - EP 1058212 A3

EP 1058212 A3 2001-02-07 - Method for processing mail pieces and mail piece processing system

Title (en)

Method for processing mail pieces and mail piece processing system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Postgutverarbeitung und Postgutverarbeitungssystem

Title (fr)

Procédé et système pour le traitement d'articles postaux

Publication

EP 1058212 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00250149 A

Priority

DE 19925194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1058212A2] Process has the following steps: in a process station (12-14), reading of dispatch data and attachment of a machine readable marking to the mail item and item storage; transport of the marked item (A) to a remote delivery station (10) with a franking machine (60) and transfer of mail data from the marking to franking machine memory (69); franking of the mail using data stored in the memory. An Independent claim is made for a post processing system using the above process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00024 (2013.01); G07B 17/00435 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00379 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058212 A2 20001206; EP 1058212 A3 20010207; EP 1058212 B1 20091021; DE 19925194 A1 20001214; DE 19925194 B4 20100812; DE 50015766 D1 20091203; US 7219084 B1 20070515

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160518

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160518

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160518

2016-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015766

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150514

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, 16547 BIRKENWERDER, DE

- Document: DE 50015766

- Effective date: 20150330

2013-04-10 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-03-21 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50015766

- Effective date: 20130126

2013-01-26 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50015766

2010-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100722

2009-12-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015766 P 20091203

2009-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2009-10-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-08-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B07C 3/00 20060101AFI20090720BHEP

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060804

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010616

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI