Global patent index - EP 1058213 A2

EP 1058213 A2 2000-12-06 - Device for loading postal rate tables

Title (en)

Device for loading postal rate tables

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Tariftabellenladen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le chargement des tables de tarification

Publication

EP 1058213 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250150 A

Priority

DE 19925381 A

Abstract (en)

Arrangement has a switch component group (20') arranged between a franking machine meter (10) and a modem (23') on one side and weighing scales (22) and postage calculator (22') on the other. A control conductor (245) links the switch group (20) so that the postage calculator can be linked directly to the modem and the postage tariff update table.

Abstract (de)

Die Anordnung zum Tariftabellenladen umfaßt eine Umschalter-Baugruppe (20, 20'), die einerseits zwischen einem Meter (10) einer Frankiermaschine und einem Modem (23 23') und andererseits zwischen einem Portorechner (22') einer externen Waage (22) und dem Modem (23, 23') geschaltet ist sowie die eine Steuerleitung (245) aufweist, um die Umschalter-Baugruppe (20) anzusteuern, so daß das Modem und der Portorechner zwecks Tariftabellenladen funktionell direkt miteinander verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00314 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00161 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00258 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00322 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00701 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058213 A2 20001206; EP 1058213 A3 20001213; EP 1058213 B1 20070919; CN 1178172 C 20041201; CN 1281198 A 20010124; DE 19925381 A1 20001207; DE 50014662 D1 20071031; US 7739205 B1 20100615

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130518

2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50014662

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130518

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130518

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120601

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120308

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080620

2008-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20071126

2007-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014662

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-10-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-09-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 17/02 A, 7G 07B 17/00 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI