Global Patent Index - EP 1058214 A1

EP 1058214 A1 2000-12-06 - Method of bidirectional data transfer and system for carrying out the same

Title (en)

Method of bidirectional data transfer and system for carrying out the same

Title (de)

Verfahren zur bidirektionalen Datenübertragung und System zur Ausführung derselben

Title (fr)

Procédé de transmission bidirectionnelle de données, et système pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 1058214 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401524 A

Priority

FR 9906863 A

Abstract (en)

The method operates as an access system of the 'hands free' type which permits access to a closed space, such as the interior of an automobile. Remote exchange of data with a recognition device installed in the closed space and an identifier designed to be carried by a user. Access is only authorized when the recognition device has authenticated the identifier. Data exchange at the same radio frequency is established, called RF exchange, e.g. at 315, 434 or 868 MHz, between the recognition device and the identifier. During the course of the data exchange, the transmission of a response signal by the identifier to the recognition device for a period (tau) of about 0.8 micro seconds, with respect to the reception by the identifier of an interrogation signal from the recognition device, so that neither the recognition device nor the identifier operate simultaneously whilst transmitting or receiving the RF exchange.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 49/00 (2006.01); B60R 25/10 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); H04B 1/59 (2006.01); H04Q 9/00 (2006.01); H04Q 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00111 (2013.01); G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00555 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01); G07C 2209/63 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058214 A1 20001206; FR 2794603 A1 20001208; FR 2794603 B1 20010907; JP 2001057691 A 20010227; US 6657536 B1 20031202

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091201

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI