Global Patent Index - EP 1058218 A2

EP 1058218 A2 2000-12-06 - Method and telecommunication device for data transmission

Title (en)

Method and telecommunication device for data transmission

Title (de)

Verfahren und Telekommunikationsvorrichtung zur Informationsübertragung

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de télécommunication pour la transmission d'information

Publication

EP 1058218 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110852 A

Priority

DE 19924759 A

Abstract (en)

A telecommunications system has a communications central office (CCO) (10), a communications processing installation (CPI) (20), a transmitter-receiver station (30) and first (40), second (41) and third (42) telecommunications devices. The CPI acts as a paging server. The CCO acts as a mobility server.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren und eine Telekommunikationsvorrichtung zur Informationsübertragung zwischen einer Telekommunikationsvorrichtung und einer Zentrale über ein Telekommunikationsnetz vorgeschlagen, das dazu dient, mittels eines Sensors eine Einflußgröße zu detektieren beziehungsweise mittels eines Aktors eine Aktion auszulösen. Hierbei wird unabhängig von einem benutzerinitiierten Verbindungsaufbau ein Endgerätesignal von der Telekommunikationsvorrichtung zur Zentrale beziehungsweise ein Signal von der Zentrale zur Telekommunikationsvorrichtung übertragen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058218 A2 20001206; EP 1058218 A3 20010718; DE 19924759 A1 20001207

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061201

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI SE

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020107

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI