Global patent index - EP 1058219 A1

EP 1058219 A1 2000-12-06 - Two step programming method of remote controller

Title (en)

Two step programming method of remote controller

Title (de)

Zwei-Stufen-Verfahren zur Programmierung von Fernsteuereinrichtung

Title (fr)

Méthode de programmation de télécommande en deux étapes

Publication

EP 1058219 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201938 A

Priority

NL 1012203 A

Abstract (en)

A method for selectively binding at least one appliance of a plurality of appliances of a system to at least one remote control of a system. The method comprises the following steps: in the first step, transmission of an identification code by at least one of the appliances to the at least one remote control is initiated by means of the at least one remote control, and in the second step, by the at least one remote control, an appliance is called whose identification code is received by the at least one remote control in step 1, through transmission of the received identification code. After this, the called appliance responds with a signal and by means of the at least one remote control, the called appliance is recorded in the system as being a bound appliance if it is to be bound to the at least one remote control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/0272 (2013.01); G08C 19/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5629868 A 19970513 - TESSIER ALAIN [CA], et al
  • [A] WO 9406106 A1 19940317 - SEIKI OY [FI], et al
  • [A] DE 19605132 A1 19970814 - KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]
  • [XA] "DEVICE SELECTION INDICATOR WITH REMOTE CONTROL", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, vol. 36, no. 4, 1 April 1993 (1993-04-01), pages 269 - 270, XP000364511, ISSN: 0018-8689

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058219 A1 20001206; NL 1012203 C2 20001204

INPADOC legal status

2011-06-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20101201

2008-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080116

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI