Global Patent Index - EP 1058225 A2

EP 1058225 A2 2000-12-06 - A disc

Title (en)

A disc

Title (de)

Scheibe

Title (fr)

Disque

Publication

EP 1058225 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304052 A

Priority

GB 9913076 A

Abstract (en)

A disc (10) captively mounted between two elements (12,14) for rotation therebetween and a blank (22) and method for manufacturing the same. The disc (10) is attached at a peripheral portion thereof to one of the elements (12,14) by a frangible connection, the breaking of which allows the disc to rotate. The blank (22) is in the form of a single piece, three portion (40,42,44) foldable sheet. The first portion (40) forms a front element (12), a second portion (42) forms a back element (14) and a third portion (44) comprises the disc (10) frangibly connected to two spacer portions (24). The blank is folded so that the third portion (44) overlies the second portion (42) and again so that the first portion (40) overlies the third portion (44). The folded blank (22) is glued together at the spacer portions (24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 11/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/23 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058225 A2 20001206; EP 1058225 A3 20010801; GB 2350922 A 20001213; GB 9913076 D0 19990804

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071201

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040331

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020109

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI