Global Patent Index - EP 1058278 A2

EP 1058278 A2 2000-12-06 - Wound magnetic circuit

Title (en)

Wound magnetic circuit

Title (de)

Gewickelter Magnetkreis

Title (fr)

Circuit magnétique bobine

Publication

EP 1058278 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00810068 A

Priority

CH 105699 A

Abstract (en)

The magnetic circuit manufacture technique has a magnetic center section (3) inside an outer coil (2) formed by winding a conductor wire on a slightly conical shaped mandril. The magnetic center is spiral in shape with one end (16) shaped away from the mandril tube axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 17/06; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/06 (2006.01); H01F 41/08 (2006.01); H01F 3/00 (2006.01); H01F 17/06 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01); H01F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/062 (2013.01); H01F 41/0206 (2013.01); H01F 41/08 (2013.01); H01F 5/02 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4902 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49071 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49073 (2013.01); Y10T 29/532 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53257 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058278 A2 20001206; EP 1058278 A3 20001213; EP 1058278 B1 20120229; JP 2000348960 A 20001215; JP 3618638 B2 20050209; US 2003115742 A1 20030626; US 2004021540 A1 20040205; US 6640419 B2 20031104; US 6987439 B2 20060117

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60046963

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: REUTELER & CIE S.A.

2012-04-26 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60046963

- Effective date: 20120426

2012-02-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2012-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-02-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2011-10-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01F 41/08 20060101AFI20110920BHEP

2011-10-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01F 41/02 20060101ALI20110920BHEP

2011-10-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01F 17/06 20060101ALI20110920BHEP

2011-09-20 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60046963

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H01F0017060000

- IPC: H01F0041080000

2008-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080129

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI