Global Patent Index - EP 1058278 A3

EP 1058278 A3 2000-12-13 - Wound magnetic circuit

Title (en)

Wound magnetic circuit

Title (de)

Gewickelter Magnetkreis

Title (fr)

Circuit magnétique bobine

Publication

EP 1058278 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 00810068 A

Priority

CH 105699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1058278A2] The magnetic circuit manufacture technique has a magnetic center section (3) inside an outer coil (2) formed by winding a conductor wire on a slightly conical shaped mandril. The magnetic center is spiral in shape with one end (16) shaped away from the mandril tube axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 17/06; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/06 (2006.01); H01F 3/00 (2006.01); H01F 17/06 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01); H01F 41/08 (2006.01); H01F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/062 (2013.01); H01F 41/0206 (2013.01); H01F 41/08 (2013.01); H01F 5/02 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4902 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49071 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49073 (2013.01); Y10T 29/532 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53257 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058278 A2 20001206; EP 1058278 A3 20001213; EP 1058278 B1 20120229; JP 2000348960 A 20001215; JP 3618638 B2 20050209; US 2003115742 A1 20030626; US 2004021540 A1 20040205; US 6640419 B2 20031104; US 6987439 B2 20060117

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60046963

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: REUTELER & CIE S.A.

2012-04-26 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60046963

- Effective date: 20120426

2012-02-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2012-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-02-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2011-10-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01F 41/08 20060101AFI20110920BHEP

2011-10-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01F 41/02 20060101ALI20110920BHEP

2011-10-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01F 17/06 20060101ALI20110920BHEP

2011-09-20 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60046963

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H01F0017060000

- IPC: H01F0041080000

2008-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080129

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI