Global patent index - EP 1058281 A2

EP 1058281 A2 2000-12-06 - Low voltage switching device with connecting bars and method for indicating the rated current of the switching device

Title (en)

Low voltage switching device with connecting bars and method for indicating the rated current of the switching device

Title (de)

Niederspannungs-Schaltgerät mit Anschlussschienen sowie Verfahren zur Erkennung des Bemessungsstromes des Schaltgerätes

Title (fr)

Appareil interrupteur de basse tension avec rails de raccordement et méthode pour indiquer le courant nominal de l'appareil interrupteur

Publication

EP 1058281 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250169 A

Priority

  • DE 19925966 A
  • DE 10021272 A

Abstract (en)

A low-voltage (LV) circuit-breaker (1) has a housing with rear-wall (4) and a frontal part containing a contact system that has at least one, and ideally, two parallel withdrawable connection rails (5,6) for connecting the contact system to an external circuit. The connecting rails (5,6) extend through window-openings located in the rear-wall (4) and are locked by fixture devices in the housing. One (5) of the connecting rails serves as a carrier of a positionally fixed switch-contact (3) and of an arcing horn (7), while the other (6) connecting rails (5,6) are connected by a hinged conductor arrangement (8) to a movable switch-contact (2) of the contact system. The exposed frontal faces of the frontal ends of the connecting rails (5,6), to which connect the contact surfaces for joining the connecting rails (5,6) to the external circuit, have recesses (11,2) for enlarging the heat-emitting surface.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Niederspannungs-Schaltgerät (1) mit durch Befestigungsmittel fixierten Anschlussschienen (5, 6) zur Verbindung eines Schaltkontaktsystems mit einem äußeren Stromkreis, weisen die stirnseitigen Enden der Anschlussschienen (5, 6) zur Vergrößerung der wärmeabgebenden Oberfläche Aussparungen (11; 12) und Einfahrschrägen (14; 15; 16; 17)auf. Die Aussparungen (11, 12) sind zur Unterscheidung der Anschlussschienen (5, 6) nennstromabhängig unterschiedlich ausgebildet. Durch ein Verfahren, bei dem ein Tastkopf (25) zur Erfassung der Ausbildung der Aussparungen (22, 24) eingesetzt wird, kann im Rahmen einer automatisierten Fertigung und Prüfung der Bemessungsstrom eines Schaltgerätes erkannt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/58; H01H 9/52; H01H 71/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/58 (2006.01); H01H 9/52 (2006.01); H01H 71/06 (2006.01); H01H 71/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/06 (2013.01); H01H 1/58 (2013.01); H01H 9/52 (2013.01); H01H 71/08 (2013.01); H01H 2009/188 (2013.01); H01H 2011/0093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058281 A2 20001206; EP 1058281 A3 20020424; EP 1058281 B1 20030813

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50003243

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121201

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120131

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110718

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100603

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090531

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080528

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031118

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003243

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BACH, MICHAEL

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, DETLEV

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SEBEKOW, MICHAEL

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: THIEDE, INGO

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SEIDLER-STAHL, GUENTER

2003-02-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TUERKMEN, SEZAI

2003-01-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020521

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI