Global patent index - EP 1058483 A1

EP 1058483 A1 2000-12-06 - Microwave oven with radiant heating element

Title (en)

Microwave oven with radiant heating element

Title (de)

Mikrowellenofen mit Strahlungsheizelement

Title (fr)

Four à micro-ondes avec élément de chauffage à rayonnement

Publication

EP 1058483 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308444 A

Priority

KR 19990019601 A

Abstract (en)

A microwave oven has a radiant heating element (139) in its cooking chamber (101). The heating element (139) can be pivoted between a horizontal position above a turntable (138) and a vertical position to one side of the turntable (138). The horizontal position is used for grilling and the vertical position is used for fan-assisted convection heating. A shield (150) is mounted to the heating element (139) so that infrared radiation is not radiated directly to food (F) on the turntable (138) when fan-assisted convection heating is taking place.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/80; F24C 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/64 (2006.01); F24C 7/02 (2006.01); F24C 7/06 (2006.01); H05B 6/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/766 (2013.01); F24C 7/06 (2013.01); H05B 6/6485 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058483 A1 20001206; EP 1058483 B1 20040526; DE 69917608 D1 20040701; DE 69917608 T2 20050707; ES 2218958 T3 20041116; KR 100395559 B1 20030825; KR 20000075155 A 20001215; RU 2175467 C2 20011027

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091026

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091026

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-05-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081005

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2218958

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-10-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69917608

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHOI, WON-WOO

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030331

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI