Global Patent Index - EP 1058486 A1

EP 1058486 A1 2000-12-06 - System for monitoring outdoor lamps and data module with a surveillance sensor

Title (en)

System for monitoring outdoor lamps and data module with a surveillance sensor

Title (de)

System zur Überwachung von Aussenleuchten sowie Datenmodul mit einem Überwachungssensor

Title (fr)

Système de surveillance pour lampes d'éclairage extérieures et un module de données pourvu d'un capteur de surveillance

Publication

EP 1058486 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111246 A

Priority

DE 19925597 A

Abstract (en)

The monitoring system has each monitored external lamp provided with a data module having a monitoring sensor and an associated data transmitter for transmission of a data telegram to a central evaluation device via a cable wire of the 3-wire cable connected to the lamp which is not used for supplying the operating voltage. An Independent claim for a data module for a monitored external lamp is also included.

Abstract (de)

Es wird davon ausgegangen, daß die Außenleuchten an ein zumindest dreiadriges Kabel angeschlossen sind. Den zu überwachenden Außenleuchten sind Datenmodule mit jeweils einem Überwachungssensor und einem mit diesem verbundenen Datensender zugeordnet. Die Datensender sind an eine ein Bezugs- oder Spannungspotential führende Ader und an eine freie, nicht zur Energieversorgung der Außenleuchten dienende Ader des Kabels als Datenader angeschlossen. Über die Datenader senden die Datensender Datentelegramme im Basisband, die von wenigstens einer ebenfalls an die Datenader angeschlossenen zentrale Auswertevorrichtung empfangen und ausgewertet werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 37/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/034 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058486 A1 20001206; DE 19925597 A1 20001207; DE 19925597 C2 20030925; HU 0002096 A2 20010228; HU 0002096 A3 20021228; HU 0002096 D0 20000828; PL 198026 B1 20080530; PL 340489 A1 20001218

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030906

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI