Global Patent Index - EP 1058500 A1

EP 1058500 A1 2000-12-13 - THE HELIOS GENE

Title (en)

THE HELIOS GENE

Title (de)

DAS HELIOS GEN

Title (fr)

GENE HELIOS

Publication

EP 1058500 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909641 A

Priority

  • US 9904224 W
  • US 7632598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943208A1] The invention features a Helios polypeptide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 37/18; A61K 31/00; A61K 38/16; C07H 21/02; C07K 16/00; C12N 1/14; C12N 1/20; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/00; C12P 21/06; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4705 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943208 A1 19990902; EP 1058500 A1 20001213; EP 1058500 A4 20020508; JP 2002504357 A 20020212

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050530

2002-05-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GEORGOPOULOS, KATIA

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORGAN, BRUCE, A.

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLEY, CLAIR

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT