Global Patent Index - EP 1058517 A2

EP 1058517 A2 2000-12-13 - EXPANDABLE PMR DEVICE AND METHOD

Title (en)

EXPANDABLE PMR DEVICE AND METHOD

Title (de)

EXPANDIERBARE VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRANSMYOKARDIALEN REVASKULARISATION UND VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REVASCULARISATION MYOCARDIQUE TRANSCUTANEE DEPLOYABLE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1058517 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99911188 A

Priority

  • US 9904987 W
  • US 3573898 A
  • US 3573798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944524A2] An intravascular device and methods for forming multiple percutaneous myocardial revascularization (PMR) holes in a heart chamber wall simultaneously. One device includes a basket formed of flexible arms carrying cutting probes over their length. The basket arms are outwardly arcuately biased so as to assume an outwardly bowed, arcuate shape when unconstrained. The device includes an inner shaft distally secured to a proximal portion of the basket and slidably disposed within an outer shaft. The inner shaft and collapsed basket can be retracted within the outer shaft, delivered intravascularly to the left ventricle, and distally advanced, forcing the basket to assume the bowed shape. Radio frequency current supplied to the electrical cutting probes burn holes into the ventricle wall and myocardium. One embodiment has high pressure fluid jet cutting means. Another embodiment uses a basket as an anchor to position a steerable cutting probe. Yet another embodiment includes a brush formed of multiple, arcuate, outwardly splayed electrodes that can contact heart chamber walls once advanced distally from a constraining outer shaft. Another embodiment includes an elongate shaft having a proximal end and a distal end, and a conductor extending therethrough. An insulator disposed around the conductor. At least one conductive loop disposed at the distal end of the shaft. The conductive loop having an electrode disposed at its distal end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/39; A61B 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/221 (2006.01); A61B 18/14 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/22 (2006.01); A61B 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 18/1492 (2013.01); A61B 18/1477 (2013.01); A61B 17/32037 (2013.01); A61B 17/32056 (2013.01); A61B 17/3207 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00247 (2013.01); A61B 2017/003 (2013.01); A61B 2017/22077 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00077 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00083 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00136 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00148 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00196 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00214 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00267 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00279 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00351 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00392 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1253 (2013.01); A61B 2018/126 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1407 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1425 (2013.01); A61B 2018/143 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1432 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1435 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1467 (2013.01); A61B 2090/3966 (2016.02); A61B 2218/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944524A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944524 A2 19990910; WO 9944524 A3 19991118; CA 2322453 A1 19990910; DE 99911188 T1 20050623; EP 1058517 A2 20001213; EP 1484025 A1 20041208; JP 2002505140 A 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-23 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041116

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030922

2001-06-29 [EM] FR: REVISED TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-03-23 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC LIMITED

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE