Global Patent Index - EP 1058654 A1

EP 1058654 A1 2000-12-13 - PLASTIC LID WITH PLASTIC SEAL

Title (en)

PLASTIC LID WITH PLASTIC SEAL

Title (de)

KUNSTSTOFFDECKEL MIT KUNSTSTOFFVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

COUVERCLE PLASTIQUE A OBTURATEUR PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1058654 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936061 A

Priority

  • DE 9900128 W
  • DE 19807768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807768A1] A bucket-like esp. plastic container has an upper rim which is folded inwards essentially in a U-shape (11, 12, 4) terminating in a lip (4'), and forming a U-shaped channel (10) with inner and outer faces. The outer channel face has a series of linked V-shaped raised ridges (9) which interlock with matching projections on a closure whose edge is inserted into the U-shaped channel (19),

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943567A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807768 A1 19990826; AU 3245899 A 19990915; AU 748929 B2 20020613; BR 9908054 A 20001031; CN 1103723 C 20030326; CN 1291160 A 20010411; EP 1058654 A1 20001213; EP 1058654 B1 20020605; ES 2174626 T3 20021101; JP 2002504465 A 20020212; RU 2215675 C2 20031110; TR 200002448 T2 20001121; US 6450357 B1 20020917; WO 9943567 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070116

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070117

2008-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070117

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070116

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-12-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050104

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2174626

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901624

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT