Global Patent Index - EP 1058655 A1

EP 1058655 A1 2000-12-13 - A CARTON HAVING A LOCKING ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

A CARTON HAVING A LOCKING ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

SCHACHTEL MIT VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

CARTON PLIANT A FERMETURE

Publication

EP 1058655 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97937689 A

Priority

  • GB 9702244 W
  • GB 9618418 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9809871A2] There is provided a carton formed from a paperboard blank (10) having oppositely disposed ends. Flaps (27) project from one end edge of the blank and each flap (27) has an associated opening (29). At the other end of the blank is an aperture (24) for cooperation with each flap (27). The flaps (27) are passed through the apertures (24), tabs (25) engage edges (30) of the openings (29) and the flaps (27) are folded over the edge portion of the other end of the blank and pushed into the openings (29). The barbs (35) then engage in cuts (31) provided at the lateral edges of the openings (29).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/12 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/14 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0016 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00172 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9809871A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9809871 A2 19980312; WO 9809871 A3 20021114; AU 4023297 A 19980326; AU 729673 B2 20010208; DE 69708705 D1 20020110; DE 69708705 T2 20020508; EP 1058655 A1 20001213; EP 1058655 B1 20011128; ES 2168661 T3 20020616; GB 9618418 D0 19961016; JP 2002513365 A 20020508; NZ 334444 A 20000128

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050822

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050821

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-08-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2005-08-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2004-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040907

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040818

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2168661

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69708705

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010116

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990226

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL