Global patent index - EP 1058661 A1

EP 1058661 A1 2000-12-13 - ELEMENT FOR FIXING A DISPENSING MEMBER ON A CONTAINER NECK, DISPENSING DEVICE COMPRISING SAME AND FIXING METHOD

Title (en)

ELEMENT FOR FIXING A DISPENSING MEMBER ON A CONTAINER NECK, DISPENSING DEVICE COMPRISING SAME AND FIXING METHOD

Title (de)

BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT EINER SPENDEVORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG AUF DEM HALS EINES BEHÄLTERS, SPENDEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SOLCHEN BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE FIXATION D'UN ORGANE DE DISTRIBUTION SUR LE COL D'UN RECIPIENT, DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION COMPORTANT UN TEL ELEMENT DE FIXATION ET PROCEDE DE FIXATION

Publication

EP 1058661 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99904940 A

Priority

  • FR 9900408 W
  • FR 9802214 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775263A1] The distributor head mounting (10) has a receiver for the dispenser (20) and a fixing (12) to the neck of the container. The mounting has a support groove (13) for a seal ring (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14; B65D 83/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/38 (2006.01); B05B 9/04 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943575A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775263 A1 19990827; FR 2775263 B1 20000414; CN 1107000 C 20030430; CN 1294562 A 20010509; DE 69901883 D1 20020725; DE 69901883 T2 20030220; EP 1058661 A1 20001213; EP 1058661 B1 20020619; JP 2002504466 A 20020212; JP 4130865 B2 20080806; US 6343722 B1 20020205; WO 9943575 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130224

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130224

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69901883

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130224

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20130104

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120320

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69901883

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-25

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011128

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT