Global Patent Index - EP 1058663 A1

EP 1058663 A1 2000-12-13 - (CIGARETTE) PACK

Title (en)

(CIGARETTE) PACK

Title (de)

(ZIGARETTEN-)PACKUNG

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE (POUR CIGARETTES)

Publication

EP 1058663 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911692 A

Priority

  • DE 19807438 A
  • EP 9901106 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807438A1] A flip-top cigarette carton (10) is wrapped in a thin e.g. cellophane outer wrapper (24). A piece of printed fan-folded paper or card (30) is positioned between the wrapper (24) and the carton (10) flip-top (22). When the outer wrapper is removed, the fan-folded paper or card opens to reveal the printed message.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/1081 (2013.01); B65D 85/10 (2013.01); B65D 2203/00 (2013.01); B65D 2203/02 (2013.01); Y10S 206/831 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807438 A1 19990826; AU 3029399 A 19990906; BR 9908181 A 20001024; CN 1123506 C 20031008; CN 1291959 A 20010418; EP 1058663 A1 20001213; EP 1058663 B1 20021204; EP 1241115 A1 20020918; EP 1241115 B1 20040825; ID 27210 A 20010308; JP 2002503601 A 20020205; JP 4068303 B2 20080326; US 2003010656 A1 20030116; US 6401918 B1 20020611; US 6681927 B2 20040127; WO 9942387 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160220

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160220

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160220

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903649

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130209

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130212

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903649 20030116

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CIGARETTE PACK WITH WRAPPING FOIL AND FOLDED PRINTING CARRIER

2002-04-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CIGARETTE PACK WITH WRAPPING FOIL AND FOLDED PRINTING CARRIER

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL