Global Patent Index - EP 1058670 A1

EP 1058670 A1 2000-12-13 - DEVICE FOR STACKING SHEETS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR STACKING SHEETS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM STAPELN VON BÖGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR EMPILER DES FEUILLES

Publication

EP 1058670 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936065 A

Priority

  • DE 19807854 A
  • EP 9900612 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943584A1] Known devices for stacking sheets (1), especially for stacking on pallets (4) paper or cardboard sheets conveyed in an overlapping stream, comprise a device (2) for conveying the sheets (1) to a depositing platform (5) which is suspended on pillars (6) in the stacking area such that it can be raised and lowered. According to the invention the depositing platform (5) is attached to two cantilever beams (9) which are each mounted on a pillar (6) in a vertically movable manner. The two cantilever beams (9) are preferably mounted on the arrival-side pillars (6) of the frame. The invention has the advantage that only two instead of four support elements are required for the depositing platform and in that it allows for a modular construction with simple adjustment of both the length and width of the stacking area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/66 (2006.01); B65H 31/10 (2006.01); B65H 31/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/30 (2013.01); B65H 29/66 (2013.01); B65H 31/10 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4212 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42256 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42264 (2013.01); B65H 2404/2615 (2013.01); B65H 2701/176 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943584 A1 19990902; EP 1058670 A1 20001213; EP 1058670 B1 20020605; EP 1058670 B2 20080820; ES 2180314 T3 20030201

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901625

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050131

2008-08-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20080820

2008-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI GB IT

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-09-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050130

2005-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050130

2005-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050130

2005-01-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050130

2004-01-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-05 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040105

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040105

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: E.C.H. WILL GMBH

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180314 T3

2002-08-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER JAGENBERG GMBH

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901625 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI GB IT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000826

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI GB IT