Global Patent Index - EP 1058693 A1

EP 1058693 A1 2000-12-13 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FRACTIONATED PECTIN PRODUCTS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FRACTIONATED PECTIN PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PEKTINFRAKTIONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PRODUITS DE PECTINE FRACTIONNEE

Publication

EP 1058693 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99965032 A

Priority

  • US 9927908 W
  • US 22411698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0039168A1] A process is described for producing fractionated pectin from vegetable source starting material. The process comprises a two-step extraction of the vegetable material by first contacting it with a weakly acidic solution at a temperature and for a time to sufficiently remove a non-calcium sensitive pectin (NCSP) fraction, separating the extract juice from the vegetable matter, and contacting the separated vegetable matter with a stronger acid solution at a temperature and for a time sufficient to remove a calcium sensitive pectin (CSP) fraction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08B 37/06; A23L 1/0524

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 29/20 (2016.01); A23L 29/231 (2016.01); C08B 37/00 (2006.01); C08B 37/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08B 37/0048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0039168A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0039168 A1 20000706; AU 3103500 A 20000731; CN 100381470 C 20080416; CN 1298413 A 20010606; EP 1058693 A1 20001213; ID 26580 A 20010118; IL 138106 D0 20011031; JP 2002533533 A 20021008; PL 201281 B1 20090331; PL 342496 A1 20010604; RU 2272812 C2 20060327; UA 73471 C2 20010215

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020427

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CP KELCO APS

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011016

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI