Global Patent Index - EP 1058722 A1

EP 1058722 A1 2000-12-13 - TENSIDE COMBINATION CONTAINING SPECIAL ANIONIC TENSIDES

Title (en)

TENSIDE COMBINATION CONTAINING SPECIAL ANIONIC TENSIDES

Title (de)

TENSIDKOMBINATION, ENTHALTEND SPEZIELLE ANIONISCHE TENSIDE

Title (fr)

COMBINAISON DE TENSIOACTIFS CONTENANT DES TENSIOACTIFS ANIONIQUES SPECIAUX

Publication

EP 1058722 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910234 A

Priority

  • DE 19807805 A
  • EP 9901053 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807805A1] The invention relates to a tenside combination for use in washing and cleaning detergents containing C12-C18-alkyl sulfates, whereby the portion of the carbon chains with fewer than 14 carbon atoms is smaller than 10 % with regard to the content of C12-C18-alkyl sulfate, and C9-C13-alkylbenzene sulfonates in a ratio of 1:10 to 10:1. The inventive tenside combination can be used in both powdery to granular washing and cleaning detergents and in liquid cleaning detergents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/12; C11D 1/83

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/12 (2006.01); C11D 1/37 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/74 (2006.01); C11D 1/75 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/37 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/74 (2013.01); C11D 1/75 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943772A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807805 A1 19990902; AT 222597 T 20020915; EP 1058722 A1 20001213; EP 1058722 B1 20020821; ES 2180283 T3 20030201; JP 2002504621 A 20020212; US 6531439 B1 20030311; WO 9943772 A2 19990902; WO 9943772 A3 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-12 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-03-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-07-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-07-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020821

2003-02-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180283 T3

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902409 20020926

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-08-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222597 T 20020915

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011210

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL