Global Patent Index - EP 1058752 A1

EP 1058752 A1 2000-12-13 - ATTACHMENT FOR A FINISHER

Title (en)

ATTACHMENT FOR A FINISHER

Title (de)

ZUSATZEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN FERTIGER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF AUXILIAIRE POUR UN FINISSEUR

Publication

EP 1058752 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917751 A

Priority

  • DE 9900479 W
  • DE 29803077 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6467992B1] An attachment device for laying two surface layers which may also consist of different materials in a road way. The device should be economical to produce and suitable for laying multilayer road surfaces or for simply laying a conventional single layer surface. To this end, the inventive attachment contains elements for simultaneously laying two layers, hot on hot. The elements are mounted on a frame to be detachably connected to the finisher, the frame having fixing points for detachably connecting the attachment and the finisher and the attachment and the driver's cab.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942664A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29803077 U1 19980625; AT 242359 T 20030615; DK 1058752 T3 20030929; EP 1058752 A1 20001213; EP 1058752 B1 20030604; ES 2201704 T3 20040316; JP 2002504636 A 20020212; JP 4076118 B2 20080416; PL 199223 B1 20080829; PL 342494 A1 20010604; PT 1058752 E 20031031; US 6467992 B1 20021022; WO 9942664 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030604

2005-01-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 04.11.2004 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2005-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HERMANN *KIRCHNER G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201704 T3

2004-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031018

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403522

2003-09-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905833 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2000-12-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000902

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE