Global Patent Index - EP 1058756 A1

EP 1058756 A1 2000-12-13 - METHOD OF DESPELLING FOG

Title (en)

METHOD OF DESPELLING FOG

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERTREIBEN VON NEBEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DISSIPATION DU BROUILLARD

Publication

EP 1058756 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99936106 A

Priority

  • NO 9900067 W
  • NO 980886 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943893A1] This invention relates to a method for dissipating or dispelling fog and/or clouds in a environmentally friendly manner and which is especially suitable for fog and clouds which have a temperature of over -2 DEG C, by placing and dispersing potassium formiate in powder form over the fog or clouds which have to be dispelled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943893A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943893 A1 19990902; AU 3279299 A 19990915; DE 69907159 D1 20030528; DE 69907159 T2 20040205; EP 1058756 A1 20001213; EP 1058756 B1 20030423; NO 314905 B1 20030610; NO 980886 A 19990830; NO 980886 D0 19980227

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120226

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69907159

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120227

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120226

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-07-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69907159 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE