Global patent index - EP 1058774 A1

EP 1058774 A1 2000-12-13 - DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE MOVEMENT PATH OF THE GAS SHUTTLE VALVE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE MOVEMENT PATH OF THE GAS SHUTTLE VALVE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM EINSTELLEN DES BEWEGUNGSVERLAUFS DER GASWECHSELVENTILE EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR AJUSTER LA TRAJECTOIRE DE MOUVEMENT DES SOUPAPES D'ECHANGE DE GAZ D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1058774 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908943 A

Priority

  • DE 19808354 A
  • EP 9901180 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943930A1] The invention relates to a device for adjusting the movement path of the gas shuttle valve of an internal combustion engine with a camshaft. The inventive device comprises a regulator which generates an adjustment signal for an adjusting element (54) of an adjusting device (5) provided for adjusting the camshaft (3). A pilot control is provided which corrects the adjustment signal in an additive manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F01L 1/344 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34406 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34443 (2013.01); F01L 2201/00 (2013.01); F01L 2800/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943930A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943930 A1 19990902; EP 1058774 A1 20001213; EP 1058774 B1 20030502; ES 2198899 T3 20040201; JP 2002505398 A 20020219; JP 4316797 B2 20090819; US 6318314 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140224

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140225

2015-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150408

2015-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140224

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140224

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-12-09 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20111104

2011-12-09 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

- Effective date: 20111104

2011-06-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110519 AND 20110525

2011-04-06 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20110325

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2198899

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-08-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905327

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE