Global Patent Index - EP 1058777 A1

EP 1058777 A1 2000-12-13 - OIL PICKUP SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, NOTABLY A SINGLE-CYLINDER DIESEL ENGINE

Title (en)

OIL PICKUP SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, NOTABLY A SINGLE-CYLINDER DIESEL ENGINE

Title (de)

ÖLANSAUGSYSTEM FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE EINEN EINZYLINDER-DIESELMOTOR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ASPIRATION D'HUILE POUR UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE, EN PARTICULIER UN MOTEUR DIESEL A UN CYLINDRE

Publication

EP 1058777 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99967005 A

Priority

  • DE 19860381 A
  • EP 9910361 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19860381A1] The invention relates to an oil pickup system for an internal combustion engine, notably a single-cylinder diesel engine, comprising at least three oil pickup tubes (26, 27, 28) which are connected to the oil pump via a suction hose (29) and are arranged in the oil pan (24) in such a way that when the internal combustion engine is positioned at an angle the intake of air is prevented by control valves assigned to the oil pick up tubes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/06 (2006.01); F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F01M 11/03 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F01M 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F01M 11/03 (2013.01); F01M 11/06 (2013.01); F02F 7/00 (2013.01); F01M 11/00 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0039436A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860381 A1 20000629; EP 1058777 A1 20001213; EP 1058777 B1 20041013; JP 2002533611 A 20021008; US 6260534 B1 20010717; WO 0039436 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061223

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061223

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060225

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910839 P 20041118

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-11-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031110

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE