Global patent index - EP 1058781 A1

EP 1058781 A1 2000-12-13 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FAST AUTOMATIC ADAPTATION OF RICHNESS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FAST AUTOMATIC ADAPTATION OF RICHNESS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNELLEN SELBSTANPASSEN DES LUFT/KRAFTSTOFFVERHÄLTNISSES IN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'AUTOADAPTATION RAPIDE DE RICHESSE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1058781 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99904923 A

Priority

  • FR 9900390 W
  • FR 9802273 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775315A1] The adaptation process is performed by a computer (21) receiving data from transducers (26,28) delivering a parameter level of fuel delivered to the engine (1) and another transducer (33) measuring levels of oxygen in the exhaust gas. A new control coefficient is generated at each adaptation cycle using an intermediate values between the last and the present data inputs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/24; F02D 35/00; F02D 41/14; F02M 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01); F02M 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/08 (2013.01); F02D 41/0032 (2013.01); F02D 41/0042 (2013.01); F02D 41/2412 (2013.01); F02D 41/2448 (2013.01); F02D 41/2454 (2013.01); F02D 41/2477 (2013.01); F02D 41/2467 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943939A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775315 A1 19990827; FR 2775315 B1 20000505; BR 9908241 A 20001031; BR 9908241 B1 20120207; DE 69903271 D1 20021107; DE 69903271 T2 20030724; EP 1058781 A1 20001213; EP 1058781 B1 20021002; ES 2184411 T3 20030401; US 6415779 B1 20020709; WO 9943939 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140222

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69903271

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69903271

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110223

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110223

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110222

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110222

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2184411

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69903271

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-07

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010924

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE